NY A10738 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7731
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7731
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that municipalities made coterminous may qualify for the citizen empowerment tax credit and the local government citizens re-organization empowerment grant program.
Title
Provides that municipalities made coterminous may qualify for the citizen empowerment tax credit and the local government citizens re-organization empowerment grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7731 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.560 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07731 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.10