NY S07731 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that municipalities made coterminous may qualify for the citizen empowerment tax credit and the local government citizens re-organization empowerment grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that municipalities made coterminous may qualify for the citizen empowerment tax credit and the local government citizens re-organization empowerment grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.10
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.435
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.560
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a10738
2012-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402
2012-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10738 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7731

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback