NY A10721 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8284 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.418 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.418 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08284 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.324