NY A10674 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify all localities in the state where the employer remitted taxes in the current or previous year and each locality that provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to real property where the employer has a place of business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify all localities in the state where the employer remitted taxes in the current or previous year and each locality that provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to real property where the employer has a place of business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-23Senate3RD READING CAL.956
2020-07-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8748
2020-07-22SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-22Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.277
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.277
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-15Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 10674a
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2020-06-24Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S07344 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
S08748 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10674A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10674
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10674&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10674
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10674&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10674A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10674&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10674&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10674&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10674#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback