NY S07344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify all localities in the state where the employer remitted taxes in the current or previous year and each locality that provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to real property where the employer has a place of business.
Title
Relates to written notice requirements for mass layoffs; includes a requirement to notify all localities in the state where the employer remitted taxes in the current or previous year and each locality that provides police, firefighting, emergency medical or ambulance services to real property where the employer has a place of business.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.363 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10674 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - approval memo.14