NY A10617 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s7485a
Status: Introduced on April 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s7485a
Summary
Enacts "Elle's Law"; relates to the suspension of driving privileges.
Title
Enacts "Elle's Law"; relates to the suspension of driving privileges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | substituted by s7485a | |
2010-06-16 | rules report cal.193 | |
2010-06-16 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-19 | print number 10617a | |
2010-05-19 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2010-04-12 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07485 (Same As) 2010-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.409
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10617&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |