NY A10609 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring voting materials to be provided in Russian.
Title
Relates to requiring voting materials to be provided in Russian.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Hakeem Jeffries [D] | Asm. Naomi Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-05 | Senate | tabled |
2012-10-03 | Senate | vetoed memo.162 |
2012-09-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1501 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7812 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.525 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07812 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10609