NY A10607 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a New York food supply working group to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on New York's food supply and related supply chain logistics in the wake of COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a New York food supply working group to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on New York's food supply and related supply chain logistics in the wake of COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.923
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8561A
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.211
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.211
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 10607a
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to agriculture
2020-06-05Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S08561 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10607A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10607
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10607A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10607&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10607#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback