NY A10606 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes technical corrections to provisions relating to the review of eligible federally qualified health center capital projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes technical corrections to provisions relating to the review of eligible federally qualified health center capital projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.400
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1320
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7602
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.279
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.279
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-07Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07602 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10606

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback