NY S07602 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes technical corrections to provisions relating to the review of eligible federally qualified health center capital projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes technical corrections to provisions relating to the review of eligible federally qualified health center capital projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10606
2012-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1320
2012-06-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-06SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A10606 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - signed chap.400

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback