NY A10569 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-14 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-14 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to telemarketing; prohibits pre-recorded messages in certain circumstances; requires a mechanism for consumers to automatically add their number to the seller's do-not-call list.
Title
Relates to telemarketing; prohibits pre-recorded messages in certain circumstances; requires a mechanism for consumers to automatically add their number to the seller's do-not-call list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.369 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1219 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7567A |
2012-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.143 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | print number 10569a |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07567 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10569A