NY A10557 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Title
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s7627 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.256 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07627 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.291