NY A10553 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7538
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7538
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authority of district attorneys to hire and retain licensed professionals.
Title
Relates to the authority of district attorneys to hire and retain licensed professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s7538 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.335 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | print number 10553a |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07538 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.358