NY A10533 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the residential care off-site facility demonstration project until June 30, 2027.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the residential care off-site facility demonstration project until June 30, 2027.
Sponsors
Asm. Sarah Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9786 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.551 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.551 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S09786 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.173