NY A10529 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "time of war" for purposes of calculating veterans service credit.
Title
Expands the definition of "time of war" for purposes of calculating veterans service credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Robert Castelli [R] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] |
Asm. Frank Skartados [D] | Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.268 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.268 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |