NY A10515 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the abandonment of cemeteries; notification and assistance.
Title
Relates to the abandonment of cemeteries; notification and assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-07 | Senate | vetoed memo.295 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1012 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7835A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1052 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07835 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10515