NY A10508 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8385a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s8385a
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.360
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-06Assemblyprint number 10508a
2018-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2018-05-04Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S08385 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10508
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10508A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10508&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback