NY A10495 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of MWBE investments for an aspirational goal of at least twenty percent of each New York state fund, to the greatest extent feasible within the bounds of financial and fiduciary prudence.
Title
Relates to the use of MWBE investments for an aspirational goal of at least twenty percent of each New York state fund, to the greatest extent feasible within the bounds of financial and fiduciary prudence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | print number 10495a |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08524 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - REFERRED TO RULES