NY A10493 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conducting hearings on a felony complaint during a state disaster emergency; appearances of any party or witness may be by electronic means so long as the judge is able to hear and see the image of each witness and such appearance is comparable to such witness being present in the courtroom.
Title
Relates to conducting hearings on a felony complaint during a state disaster emergency; appearances of any party or witness may be by electronic means so long as the judge is able to hear and see the image of each witness and such appearance is comparable to such witness being present in the courtroom.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.123 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.45 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10493 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.665 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8414 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.45 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08414 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.123