NY S08414 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to conducting hearings on a felony complaint during a state disaster emergency; appearances of any party or witness may be by electronic means so long as the judge is able to hear and see the image of each witness and such appearance is comparable to such witness being present in the courtroom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to conducting hearings on a felony complaint during a state disaster emergency; appearances of any party or witness may be by electronic means so long as the judge is able to hear and see the image of each witness and such appearance is comparable to such witness being present in the courtroom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.123
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-28Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.45
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted for a10493
2020-05-27Assemblyreferred to codes
2020-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.665
2020-05-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A10493 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8414

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback