NY A10461 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".
Title
Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.966 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08607 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE