NY A10456 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a tax exemption and a tax abatement for alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings for purposes of preserving habitability in affordable housing.
Title
Authorizes a tax exemption and a tax abatement for alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings for purposes of preserving habitability in affordable housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Ron Kim [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.759 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.759 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |