NY A10453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9059a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9059a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the imposition of an occupancy tax in the village of Briarcliff Manor.
Title
Authorizes the imposition of an occupancy tax in the village of Briarcliff Manor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9059a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.648 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.648 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10453a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09059 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.468