NY A10445 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to civil service provisional employees; extends certain provisions.
Title
Relates to civil service provisional employees; extends certain provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Herman Farrell [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.467 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1977 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7944 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.254 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07944 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10445