NY A10442 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the determination of adjusted base proportions in special assessing units which are cities.
Title
Relates to the determination of adjusted base proportions in special assessing units which are cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s9372 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.587 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09372 (Same As) 2022-06-10 - SIGNED CHAP.215