NY A10442 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the superintendent of financial services additional powers to take action against insurers which are in a hazardous financial condition.
Title
Grants the superintendent of financial services additional powers to take action against insurers which are in a hazardous financial condition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to insurance |