NY A10427 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8985
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8985
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Westchester; provides the district attorney may appoint someone residing in any county of the ninth judicial district.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Westchester; provides the district attorney may appoint someone residing in any county of the ninth judicial district.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8985 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.585 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08985 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.344