NY A10425 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain lodging facilities to make available information concerning services for human trafficking victims.
Title
Requires certain lodging facilities to make available information concerning services for human trafficking victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | signed chap.190 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2012 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8874 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 10425a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.854 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08874 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10425A