NY A10422 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - substituted by s7241
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - substituted by s7241
Summary
To authorize the town planning board to extend conditional approval of a final plat if such extension is warranted by the particular circumstances.
Title
Relates to extentions of conditional approval of subdivision plats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | substituted by s7241 | |
2010-05-27 | advanced to third reading cal.960 | |
2010-05-25 | reported | |
2010-03-25 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07241 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.522
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10422&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |