NY A10406 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the rural suicide prevention council; requires biennial reports on the findings of the council.
Title
Creates the rural suicide prevention council; requires biennial reports on the findings of the council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | print number 10406b |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | print number 10406a |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07920 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - referred to ways and means