NY A10375 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the real property of a land bank from all special ad valorem levies and special assessments as defined in section one hundred two of the real property tax law.
Title
Exempts the real property of a land bank from all special ad valorem levies and special assessments as defined in section one hundred two of the real property tax law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s7880 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.213 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.213 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07880 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.441