NY A10365 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the chief administrator of the courts' authority to allow referees to determine certain applications to a family court for an order of protection; removes the expiration of the judicial hearing officer pilot program in the family courts of the seventh and eighth judicial districts for ordering a reference to determine an application for an order of protection or temporary order of protection in certain cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the chief administrator of the courts' authority to allow referees to determine certain applications to a family court for an order of protection; removes the expiration of the judicial hearing officer pilot program in the family courts of the seventh and eighth judicial districts for ordering a reference to determine an application for an order of protection or temporary order of protection in certain cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31Senatesigned chap.161
2018-07-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1325
2018-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8324
2018-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.850
2018-05-01Assemblyreported
2018-04-24Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-04-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S08324 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10365

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10365&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10365&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10365
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10365&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10365&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10365&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10365#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback