NY A10365 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reform of charitable corporations and trust governance.
Title
Relates to the reform of charitable corporations and trust governance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.466 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1331 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7913B |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.248 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.248 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10365b |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | print number 10365a |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07913 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10365B