NY A10355 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s5858b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s5858b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the process of selling surplus fire equipment and vehicles.
Title
Relates to the process of selling surplus fire equipment and vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s5858b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.209 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.209 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05858 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.430