NY A10348 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the forfeiture of unemployment benefits during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Title
Suspends the forfeiture of unemployment benefits during the COVID-19 state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means Correction Date:05/27/2020 (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means Correction Date:05/27/2020 (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.97 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | substituted for a10348a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.654 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8275A |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8275a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.35 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | print number 10348a |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08275 (Same As) 2020-06-13 - SIGNED CHAP.97