NY A10347 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American lobster to December 31, 2027.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage American lobster to December 31, 2027.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1320 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9318 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.137 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.137 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09318 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10347