NY A10343 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to improving the medical parole certification and consideration process for inmates suffering from terminal or debilitating illnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to improving the medical parole certification and consideration process for inmates suffering from terminal or debilitating illnesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.185
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.185
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-04-12Assemblyreferred to correction

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback