NY A10340 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electors to vote for the presidential and vice presidential candidate who received the highest number of votes in the state.
Title
Requires electors to vote for the presidential and vice presidential candidate who received the highest number of votes in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10340b |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.893 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6886D |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6886C |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6886B |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6886A |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-12-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s6886d |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.327 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10340b |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | print number 10340a |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06886 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327