NY S06886 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electors to vote for the presidential and vice presidential candidate who received the highest number of votes in the state.
Title
Requires electors to vote for the presidential and vice presidential candidate who received the highest number of votes in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10340b |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.893 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886D |
2020-07-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886C |
2020-07-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886B |
2020-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6886A |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-12-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10340 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.327