NY A10304 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes permanent the authorization to assisted living programs in certain counties to increase the availability of assisted living beds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes permanent the authorization to assisted living programs in certain counties to increase the availability of assisted living beds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.397
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1083
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6948
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.497
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.497
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-01Assemblyreference changed to health
2012-05-22Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S06948 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10304

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback