NY A10302 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Title
Authorizes the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.465 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2005 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7790A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.208 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.208 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07790 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10302