NY A10292 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7534a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7534a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to filing a report on examination.
Title
Relates to filing a report on examination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7534a |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.417 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.417 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 10292a |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07534 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - VETOED MEMO.221