NY A10269 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a court to order the division of criminal justice services to compare fingerprints of the defendant against the statewide database.
Title
Authorizes a court to order the division of criminal justice services to compare fingerprints of the defendant against the statewide database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.681 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |