NY A10269 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The bill authorizes the Department of Environmental Conservation to adopt rules and regulations to regulate coastal and marine activities that threaten seagrass.
Title
Establishes the seagrass protection act; defines terms; outlines department of environmental conservation's responsibilities; provides that a person in a coastal community may not apply a fertilizer containing the plant nutrient phosphorus after November first and before April first.
Sponsors
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] |
Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | tabled | |
2010-08-30 | vetoed memo.6779 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-30 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.1364 | |
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8343 | |
2010-06-29 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-29 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-29 | repassed assembly | |
2010-06-24 | amended on third reading 10269b | |
2010-06-24 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | recalled from senate | |
2010-06-14 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-14 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-14 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-09 | amended on third reading 10269a | |
2010-03-25 | advanced to third reading cal.763 | |
2010-03-23 | reported | |
2010-03-16 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S7235 (Same As) 2010-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7235A