NY A10263 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to Hon. Joseph J. Maltese for the period of January 1, 2021 to November 7, 2021.
Title
Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to Hon. Joseph J. Maltese for the period of January 1, 2021 to November 7, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Assembly | signed chap.419 |
2024-09-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1895 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9295 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.371 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09295 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10263