NY A10263 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7890
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the management of American lobster.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the management of American lobster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s7890 |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.883 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07890 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.224