NY A10241 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - signed chap.81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - signed chap.81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from June 30, 2016 to June 30, 2018, the expiration of certain provisions of the Nassau county administrative code relating to assessments and the review of assessments.
Title
Extends from June 30, 2016 to June 30, 2018, the expiration of certain provisions of the Nassau county administrative code relating to assessments and the review of assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.81 |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1302 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7649 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.146 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10241a |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07649 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10241A