NY A10227 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Niagara Falls to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to firefighter Richard E. Mylchreest.
Title
Authorizes the city of Niagara Falls to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to firefighter Richard E. Mylchreest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.169 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1483 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7526 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.496 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.496 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | print number 10227a |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07526 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10227A