NY A10206 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the comptroller to enter into a contract with the administrator of the NYS college choice tuition savings program for the purpose of administering the NY ABLE savings account program and providing account depositories and managers.
Title
Allows the comptroller to enter into a contract with the administrator of the NYS college choice tuition savings program for the purpose of administering the NY ABLE savings account program and providing account depositories and managers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.149 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1374 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7882 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.369 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.369 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07882 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10206