NY A10189 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that school districts, including the city school district of the city of New York, are entited to an apportionment of state aid for the closure of schools due in response to the novel coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that school districts, including the city school district of the city of New York, are entited to an apportionment of state aid for the closure of schools due in response to the novel coronavirus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.107
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-27Senatereturned to senate
2020-05-27Senatepassed assembly
2020-05-27Senateordered to third reading rules cal.27
2020-05-27Senatesubstituted for a10189a
2020-05-27Senatereferred to ways and means
2020-05-27AssemblyDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27AssemblyPASSED SENATE
2020-05-27AssemblyORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.640
2020-05-26AssemblyREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-24AssemblyCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-05-24AssemblyPRINT NUMBER 7996B
2020-05-24AssemblyAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2020-03-13AssemblyPRINT NUMBER 7996A
2020-03-13AssemblyAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2020-03-06AssemblyREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted by s7996b
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.27
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-27Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-05-24Assemblyprint number 10189a
2020-05-24Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2020-03-24Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S07996 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.107

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10189
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10189&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10189
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10189&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10189A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10189&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10189&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10189&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10189#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10189#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10189#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback